Moist, Louise Maureen (CPSO#: 66637)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Oct 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8211
Fax: (519) 685-8449
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Moist Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 01 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Moist ( CPSO# 66637 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
Room A2-338
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8211

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Sep 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 10 Sep 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LOUISE MAUREEN MOIST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOIST is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 1997