Mok, Andrea Hon-Yee (CPSO#: 82957)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 6C
163 Commissioners Road West
London ON  N6J 1X9
Phone: (519) 472-8253
Fax: (519) 471-1094
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrea Mok Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 12 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mok ( CPSO# 82957 )

Business Address:
163 Commissioners Road West
Suite 6C
London ON  N6J 1X9
Phone Number: (519) 472-8253

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREA HON-YEE MOK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2007