Mok, Jean (CPSO#: 101092)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Georgian Bay General Hospital
1112 St Andrews Dr
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Phone: (705) 526-1300
Fax: 705-526-9938
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Uxbridge Cottage Hospital
4 Campbell Dr
Uxbridge, ON
Uxbridge ON  L9P 1R5
Canada
Phone: (905) 852-9771
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

1230 North Shore Blvd E
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Canada
Phone: (905) 632-3737
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Mok Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 13 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Mok ( CPSO# 101092)

Business Address:
Georgian Bay General Hospital
1112 St Andrews Drive
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Phone Number: (705) 526-1300

Business Address:
4 Campbell Drive
Uxbridge ON  L9P 1S4
Phone Number: (905) 852-9771

Business Address:
6 Albert Street
Parry Sound ON  P2A 3A4
Phone Number: (705) 746-4540

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Markham-Stouffville,Cottage Hospital Site Uxbridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEAN MOK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 14 Sep 2015 to 04 Dec 2015
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2015