Mok, Tony Shu Kam (CPSO#: 58647)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jul 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Alberta, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jul 2002