Mokwe, Marius Obiesie (CPSO#: 46666)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Jul 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematology Effective: 21 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jul 2002