Molckovsky, Andrea (CPSO#: 81048)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Feb 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Feb 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Regional Cancer Centre
P O Box 9056
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300 Ext. 5262
Fax: (519) 749-4378
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Molckovsky Paun Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 27 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Molckovsky ( CPSO# 81048 )
Dr. B. Paun ( CPSO# 77564 )

Business Address:
Grand River Regional Cancer Centre
835 King Street West
PO Box 9056
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4370

Business Address:
525 Belmont Avenue
Sute 102
Kitchener ON  N2M 5E2
Phone Number: (519) 741-5338

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 23 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREA MOLCKOVSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOLCKOVSKY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2010