Moldes, Andrea Paola (CPSO#: 82698)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Prenatal Well Baby Clinic
5 Quarry Ridge Rd. Suite 304
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone: 705-721-0370 Ext. 4
Fax: 705-725-8781
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Royal Court Medical Centre
1 Quarry Ride Rd. Suite LL2
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Canada
Phone: 705-797-8801
Fax: 705-797-8808
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vennettilli Moldes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 11 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Moldes ( CPSO# 82698 )
Dr. M. Vennettilli ( CPSO# 82432 )

Business Address:
Prenatal Well Baby Clinic
304-5 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 721-0370

Business Address:
1 Quarry Ridge Road
Suite LL2
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 797-8801

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 792-3324

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREA PAOLA MOLDES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOLDES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2007