Molgat, Yvonne Marguerite (CPSO#: 64223)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 14 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 15 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Jun 1999