Moll, Allan Leigh (CPSO#: 66495)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Spanish

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
7700 Bathurst Street
Suite 101
Thornhill ON  L4J 7Y3
Phone: (905) 764-8242
Fax: (905) 695-0329
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Allan L. Moll Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 14 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Moll ( CPSO# 66495 )

Business Address:
7700 Bathurst Street
Suite 101
Thornhill ON  L4J 7Y3
Phone Number: (905) 764-8242

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALLAN LEIGH MOLL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOLL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1995