Mollot, Kimberley Deanne (CPSO#: 82417)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Halton Healthcare Services
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Fax: 905-815-5076
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mollot Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Mollot ( CPSO# 82417 )

Business Address:
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 13 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIMBERLEY DEANNE MOLLOT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOLLOT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012