Molloy, David William (CPSO#: 56190)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Hamilton Health Sciences at St. Peter's Hospital, 88 Maplewood Avenue Hamilton, Ontario L8M 1W9
Date Received: 17 Jun 2010

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 04 Dec 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Aug 2010