Molnar, Paula Catherine (CPSO#: 67959)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 510
89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone: (905) 273-4380
Fax: (905) 273-4335
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAULA CATHERINE MOLNAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOLNAR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1996 to 31 Oct 1996
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1996