Moloney, Michael Anthony (CPSO#: 91677)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 May 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 May 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: University Hospital Limerick Limerick, Ireland
Date Received: 25 Apr 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Ireland

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 18 Sep 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 19 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 May 2016