Moloughney, Brent Ward Patrick (CPSO#: 56843)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
480 University Avenue, Suite 300
Toronto ON  M5G 1V2
Phone: 647-260-7707
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Community Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRENT WARD PATRICK MOLOUGHNEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOLOUGHNEY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Community Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Community Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Community Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1987