Molson, Jenny Louise (CPSO#: 59571)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Oct 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
146 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7K 6M9
Phone: (613) 533-2506
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

800 Princess Street, suite 105
Kingston ON  K7L 5E4
Canada
Phone: (613) 544-7910
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNY LOUISE MOLSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOLSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Sep 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 1989