Moltzan, Catherine Jane (CPSO#: 72933)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 18 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Hematological Pathology Effective: 31 Jul 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 1998 to 31 Jul 1999
Resident 3 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 1999 to 31 Jul 2000
Resident 4 - Hematological Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2000