Monaghan, Michael James (CPSO#: 62816)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
715-A Arlington Park Place
Kingston ON  K7M 7E4
Phone: (613) 384-8222
Fax: (613) 384-8221
Electoral District: 06

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL JAMES MONAGHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MONAGHAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1990