Monaghan, Ronald Anthony (CPSO#: 59544)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Dec 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 205
1637 Woodroffe Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2G 1W2
Phone: (613) 733-0964
Fax: (613) 733-0008
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R.A. Monaghan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 12 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Monaghan ( CPSO# 59544 )

Business Address:
Suite 205
1637 Woodroffe Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2G 1W2
Phone Number: (613) 733-0964

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 08 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RONALD ANTHONY MONAGHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MONAGHAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1989