Monahan, Mary Anne (CPSO#: 76455)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
75 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Phone: (613) 562-6262 Ext. 4010
Fax: (613) 562-4265
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anne Monahan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 08 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Monahan ( CPSO# 76455 )

Business Address:
Suite 423Y
75 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Phone Number: (613) 562-6262

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY ANNE MONAHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MONAHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Care of the Elderly

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2004