Monavvari, Arsalan (CPSO#: 84817)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, French, Iranian, Persian

Education:Ghazvin University of Medical Sciences, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
77 Provost Drive
Toronto ON  M2K 0B7
Phone: (416) 901-7407
Fax: (416) 901-9780
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Markham Stouffville hospital,
Administration, Room A1703
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 0T1
Canada
Phone: 905-472-2000
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Monavvari Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 04 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Monavvari ( CPSO# 84817 )

Business Address:
77 Provost Drive
North York ON  M2K 0B7
Phone Number: (416) 901-7407

Business Address:
202 - 379 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 0T1
Phone Number: (905) 472-2200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARSALAN MONAVVARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MONAVVARI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2008