Mondal, Tapas Kumar (CPSO#: 80525)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Feb 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 14 Feb 2005

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English, Hindi, Oriya

Education:University of Calcutta, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Pediatrics
Pediatric Cardiology 3A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75259
Fax: (905) 521-7914
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tapas Mondal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 31 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. U. Sarkar ( CPSO# 87406 )
Dr. T. Mondal ( CPSO# 80525 )

Business Address:
Department of Paediatrics
Paediatric Cardiology 3A 35
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100


Corporation Name: Ujjaini Sarkar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 04 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. U. Sarkar ( CPSO# 87406 )
Dr. T. Mondal ( CPSO# 80525 )

Business Address:
115 Charing Cross Street
Brantford ON  N3R 2H6
Phone Number: (519) 754-3536

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 25 Oct 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 25 Oct 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 Mar 2004 to 09 Apr 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 10 Apr 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 13 Feb 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 13 Feb 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 13 Feb 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 13 Feb 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 13 Feb 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 13 Feb 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2010 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Tapas Kumar Mondal may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Paediatrics,  McMaster  University,  in  which  Dr. Mondal holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor,  including
                        the Division of Cardiology at the Hospital for Sick Children, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirement of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The  certificate  of  registration  will  automatically  expires when Dr.
                  Mondal no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.