Monette, Gerard (CPSO#: 27744)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 09 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Oct 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008