Money, Phyllis Man Fei (CPSO#: 64188)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 25 Nov 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Nov 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 May 1996
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jun 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 May 1997
Resident 5 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jun 1997 to 30 Nov 1997
Resident 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 May 1993
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 25 Nov 1998