Monforton, Anne Marie (CPSO#: 58558)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jan 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Wonderland South Medical Clinic
1051 Wonderland Road South
London ON  N6K 3X4
Phone: (519) 472-2060
Fax: (519) 471-7299
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anne Marie Monforton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 18 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Monforton ( CPSO# 58558 )

Business Address:
Aim Health Group
1051 Wonderland Road South
London ON  N6K 3X4
Phone Number: (519) 472-2060

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNE MARIE MONFORTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MONFORTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 1989