Monforton, Francis Louis Rosario (CPSO#: 19087)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 01 Jan 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Mar 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2004