Monga, Trilok Nath (CPSO#: 28611)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Lucknow, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 12 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jul 2004