Monjed, Alaa Khalil R (CPSO#: 86094)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 03 Oct 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Oct 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Umm Al Qura University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 17 Apr 2007 to 29 Jun 2007
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 30 Jun 2007 to 29 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 30 Jun 2008 to 13 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 14 Oct 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 10 Jan 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 11 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 03 Oct 2013
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Oct 2013