Monk, Charles Michael (CPSO#: 30354)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Aug 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Aug 1978

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 103
704 Mara Street
Point Edward ON  N7V 1X4
Phone: (519) 344-8283
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Charles M. Monk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Monk ( CPSO# 30354 )

Business Address:
103 - 704 Mara Street
Point Edward ON  N7V 1X4
Phone Number: (519) 344-8283

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARLES MICHAEL MONK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MONK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1978