Monson, Rochelle Leigh (CPSO#: 70310)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: Mandelcorn, Rochelle Leigh (used until: 17 May 2001 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 700
200 Windflower Gate
Woodbridge ON  L4L 9K8
Phone: (905) 856-2100
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

4256 Bathurst St #400
North York ON  M3H 5Y8
Canada
Phone: (416) 633-0001
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Dermatology Effective: 04 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROCHELLE LEIGH MONSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MONSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2003 to 31 Mar 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2003 to 30 Sep 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Jan 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2004