Monsour, Marc (CPSO#: 104373)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 23 Sep 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin Trinity College, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital Rehabilitation Ctre
Dept of Physical Medicine and
Rehabilitation
505 Smyth Road Room 1105
Ottawa ON  K1H 8M2
Phone: (613) 737-7350 Ext. 75596
Electoral District: 07

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARC MONSOUR shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. MONSOUR is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. MONSOUR shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MONSOUR is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. MONSOUR shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. MONSOUR is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. MONSOUR no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
Assessment Verification Period - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018