Montag, Randy Joseph James (CPSO#: 76516)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Sep 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
118 7th Avenue
Hanover ON  N4N 2G9
Phone: (519) 364-2820
Fax: (519) 364-3965
Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Walkerton Site Walkerton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RANDY JOSEPH JAMES MONTAG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MONTAG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 19 Sep 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2004