Montague, Michael (CPSO#: 89373)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Canadian Forces HSC Ottawa
Department of Family Medicine
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1G 2Y7
Phone: (613) 945-1140
Fax: (613) 945-1347
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

WDMH
566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Canada
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07

Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Canada
Phone: (613) 721-2000
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Children's Hospital of Eastern
Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-7600
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Montague Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 25 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Montague ( CPSO# 89373 )

Business Address:
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Business Address:
WDMH
566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Phone Number: (613) 774-2422

Business Address:
Canadian Forces HSC Ottawa
Department of Family Medicine
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1G 2Y7
Phone Number: (613) 945-1140

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL MONTAGUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MONTAGUE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2010