Montanera, Walter Joseph (CPSO#: 31960)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jan 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
CC3-075
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5671
Fax: (416) 864-5380
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Common Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Vlachou ( CPSO# 90004 )
Dr. D. Deva ( CPSO# 93514 )
Dr. G. Mnatzakanian ( CPSO# 88831 )
Dr. J. Barfett ( CPSO# 84352 )
Dr. A. Zalev ( CPSO# 24495 )
Dr. D. Sarma ( CPSO# 76653 )
Dr. V. Prabhudesai ( CPSO# 81446 )
Dr. D. Pearce ( CPSO# 65503 )
Dr. L. Noel De Tilly ( CPSO# 62846 )
Dr. D. Muradali ( CPSO# 59826 )
Dr. W. Montanera ( CPSO# 31960 )
Dr. D. Marcuzzi ( CPSO# 54207 )
Dr. T. Marotta ( CPSO# 53911 )
Dr. W. Mak ( CPSO# 85186 )
Dr. A. Kirpalani ( CPSO# 74950 )
Dr. B. Gray ( CPSO# 58202 )
Dr. F. Goldberg ( CPSO# 50752 )
Dr. T. Dowdell ( CPSO# 55456 )
Dr. A. Bharatha ( CPSO# 79389 )
Dr. E. Colak ( CPSO# 79512 )
Dr. A. Common ( CPSO# 59024 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5680


Corporation Name: Montanera Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 14 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Montanera ( CPSO# 31960 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Room CC3-075
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5671

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 29 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WALTER JOSEPH MONTANERA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MONTANERA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 18 Jun 1979 to 16 Jun 1980
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1988 to 30 Jun 1988
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 31 Dec 1989
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 1984