Monte, Myrna Maria (CPSO#: 66801)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 101
14 Ramblewood Drive
Wasaga Beach ON  L9Z 0C4
Phone: (705) 429-1595
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Singh-Monte Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 16 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Singh ( CPSO# 66804 )
Dr. M. Monte ( CPSO# 66801 )

Business Address:
Suite 101
14 Ramblewood Drive
Wasaga Beach ON  L9Z 0C4
Phone Number: (705) 429-1595

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MYRNA MARIA MONTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MONTE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1995