Monteith, Bethany Elaine (CPSO#: 102787)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Apr 2014

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 08 Apr 2014

Summary

Former Name: Durling, Bethany Elaine (used until: 24 May 2015 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queen's University
Division of Hematology
94 Stuart Street
Etherington Hall Room 2015
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone: (613) 533-2323
Electoral District: 06

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 24 Oct 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BETHANY ELAINE MONTEITH shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. MONTEITH is enrolled at QUEEN'S UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. MONTEITH shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MONTEITH is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. MONTEITH shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. MONTEITH is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. MONTEITH no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 08 Apr 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 20 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 21 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 20 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 21 Oct 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 20 Oct 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 21 Oct 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 23 Oct 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

Queen's University, 24 Oct 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018