Montgomery, Christopher William (CPSO#: 66449)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Dec 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Dec 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 205
1400 Ritson Road North
Oshawa ON  L1G 7W4
Phone: (905) 433-0710
Fax: (905) 433-2108
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christopher Montgomery Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 23 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Montgomery ( CPSO# 66449 )

Business Address:
205 - 1400 Ritson Road North
Oshawa ON  L1G 7W4
Phone Number: (905) 433-0710

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 05 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER WILLIAM MONTGOMERY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MONTGOMERY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Oct 1997
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 1997