Montgomery, George David (CPSO#: 86265)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hôpital Montfort
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Fax: (613) 748-4914
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. G. Montgomery Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 16 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Montgomery ( CPSO# 86265 )

Business Address:
Hospital Montfort
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEORGE DAVID MONTGOMERY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MONTGOMERY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012