Montgomery, Hugh John (CPSO#: 25867)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Feb 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Feb 1978

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2660 Marchurst Road
Dunrobin ON  K0A 1T0
Phone: (613) 832-2515
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Emergency Department
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Canada
Phone: (613) 721-4710
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Montgomery Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 15 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Montgomery ( CPSO# 25867 )

Business Address:
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Emergency Department
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HUGH JOHN MONTGOMERY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MONTGOMERY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 1978