Montiveros, Carolina (CPSO#: 87445)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:National University of Cordoba, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Jenny Trout Centre
Suite 113
342 Erie Street
Stratford ON  N5A 2N4
Phone: (519) 272-2040
Fax: (519) 272-2323
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carolina Montiveros Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 17 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Montiveros ( CPSO# 87445 )

Business Address:
The Jenny Trout Centre
Suite 113
342 Erie Street
Stratford ON  N5A 2N4
Phone Number: (519) 272-2040

Business Address:
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone Number: (519) 272-8210

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
South Huron Hospital Exeter
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROLINA MONTIVEROS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MONTIVEROS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 23 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 24 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Jul 2010
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010