Montminy-Metivier, Stephane (CPSO#: 80106)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 May 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 May 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 09 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 23 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 May 2006