Montour, Laura Jean (CPSO#: 84334)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. L. Montour Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 9 2014

Medical Records Location

Address: Avenue Medical Centre 221 Brant Avenue Brantford, ON N3T 3J3
Date Received: 03 Jun 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014