Montpetit, Madeleine Rita Maria (CPSO#: 61140)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 May 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Riverside Hospital Family Health
Team
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone: (613) 738-8219
Fax: (613) 738-8217
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MADELEINE RITA MARIA MONTPETIT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MONTPETIT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1989 to 14 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 1991