Montpetit, Vital Joseph Arthur (CPSO#: 19655)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 01 Jan 1967 RCPSC Specialist
Neuropathology Effective: 01 Jan 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jun 2010