Monzon, Jose Gerard (CPSO#: 87654)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Tom Baker Cancer Centre 1331 29th Street North-West Calgary, Alberta T2N 4N2
Date Received: 03 May 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 27 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2007 to 30 Sep 2007
Elective Trainee - Medical Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
Elective Trainee - Medical Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Aug 2012
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013