Mooallem, Ronit (CPSO#: 61208)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Jul 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Nov 1991 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jul 2001