Moodley, Uthaman Otto (CPSO#: 76595)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 23 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jul 2004