Moola, Cassim (CPSO#: 41774)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Apr 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Apr 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Natal, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
564 Belmont Avenue West
Unit 101
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Phone: (226) 646-4555
Fax: (226) 646-4556
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

430 The Boardwalk
Suite 104
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Canada
Phone: (519) 576-8760
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Moola Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 17 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Moola ( CPSO# 41774 )

Business Address:
101 - 564 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Phone Number: (519) 646-4555

Business Address:
430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Phone Number: (519) 576-8760

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 25 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CASSIM MOOLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOOLA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Sep 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 1988
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 19 Feb 1991