Moola, Farhad Oliver (CPSO#: 79833)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 07 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Sep 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2003
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 08 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2004