Moon, Byung-Choo (CPSO#: 51233)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jun 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:Queen's University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
30 Prospect Street
Suite 300
Newmarket ON  L3Y 3S9
Phone: (905) 898-7777
Fax: (905) 898-0880
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Byung Moon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Moon ( CPSO# 51233 )

Business Address:
300 - 30 Prospect Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 3S9
Phone Number: (905) 898-7777

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 26 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BYUNG-CHOO MOON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 2 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Research Fellows - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Cardiovascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 6 - Cardiovascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 31 Dec 1990
Resident 5 - Cardiovascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1991 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Cardiovascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 01 Aug 1992
Clinical Fellow - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 1984