Moon, Isobel Davidson (CPSO#: 11693)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Aug 1989

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 1945

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1952 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 1945
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Mar 1947
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Aug 1989